WEST HANNINGFIELD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 213706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Helping people or organisations in the Civil Parish of West Hanningfield

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £1,150
Total expenditure: £2,517

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert John Stacey Chair 26 March 2019
None on record
Michael James Robson Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
ROSEMARY ANN COTTON Trustee 25 November 2013
None on record
LORRAINE THERESA SIMS Trustee 07 December 2012
None on record
THELMA GEORGINA ALEXANDER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £919 £878 £895 £893 £1.15k
Total expenditure £2.34k £0 £0 £5.50k £2.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 21 February 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MIMIZAN
CHURCH ROAD
WEST HANNINGFIELD
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8UQ
Phone:
01245401437
Website:

No information available