Financial history HARLEY'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 213729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.81k £30.37k £27.80k £25.68k £28.35k
Total expenditure £30.89k £19.42k £25.02k £21.87k £29.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A