TEMPERANCE HALL FUND
Charity Number: 213743
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Bradford City
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 February 1963: Standard registration
- 23 September 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- BRADFORD TEMPERANCE HALL FUND (Working name)
- TEMPERANCE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 07 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10TH AUGUST 1954 AS AMENDED ON 20 JANUARY 2000 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FURTHERING THE PRINCIPLES AND TOWARDS SECURING THE PRACTICE OF TOTAL ABSTINENCE FROM ALCOHOLIC DRINKS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CITY OF BRADFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window