BONHAM HAYES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to those residents on low incomes in the parish of Cobham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 18 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Adewale King Cllr | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Bobby | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY DOROTHY FAIRWEATHER JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £2.73k | £2.97k | £3.66k | £3.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £1.95k | £1.95k | £2.10k | £2.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF BONHAM HAYES DATED THE 26TH MARCH 1795 AND AMENDED 4TH AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
TO DISTRIBUTE THE PROFITS OF THE TRUST PROPERTY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF COBHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS ON MONEY.
Area of benefit
COBHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gravesham Borough Council
Civic Centre
Windmill Street
GRAVESEND
DA12 1AU
- Phone:
- 01474 337000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window