Hudson's and Storer's Charities

Charity Number: 213831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Almshouses and poor relief

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £117,180
Total expenditure: £212,796

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROBERT HUDSON'S ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
  • ROBERT HUDSON'S ALMSHOUSES AND OTHER CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Chatfeild-Roberts Trustee 02 August 2017
NUFFIELD TRUST FOR THE FORCES OF THE CROWN
Received: On time
JOHN WILLIAM EASOM Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
Dr ROBIN JAMES BRYANT Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
CHARLOTTE SARAH BONSHOR Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
BENJAMIN WILLIAM SHOULER Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
TIMOTHY WEBSTER Trustee 02 August 2017
MELTON MOWBRAY TOWN ESTATE
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
MARTIN PETER COE Trustee 02 August 2017
None on record
PETER WILLIAM EASOM Trustee 01 January 1990
None on record
Rev Simon Frederic SHOULER Trustee
LONG CLAWSON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
JOHN GARTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £109.58k £362.68k £93.59k £320.66k £117.18k
Total expenditure £33.06k £290.78k £251.04k £386.02k £212.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2022 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN P.R. ON THE 3RD MAY 1910 (U.V.158 PAGE 52) AND SCHEME OF THE 5TH JANUARY 1967.
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF ROBERT HUDSON'S ALMSHOUSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MELTON MOWBRAY
Registration history
  • 01 February 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
COUNTY CHAMBERS
KINGS ROAD
MELTON MOWBRAY
LE13 1QF
Phone:
01664560181
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available