CHARITY OF MISS ANN FARRAR BRIDEOAKE

Charity Number: 213848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grant to individuals. The beneficiaries are communicants of the Church of England resident in the Diocese of York, Liverpool and Manchester.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £158,384
Total expenditure: £72,368

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • Lancashire
  • Liverpool City
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY OF MISS ANN FARRAR BRIDECAKE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID JOHN CLARKE Trustee
THE BRADSHAW GASS TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID MICHAEL GIBSON Trustee
THE BRADSHAW GASS TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD WILLIAM RUSBY Trustee
RIPLEY AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
HERBERT WILLIAM MAWER TRUST
Received: On time
YORKSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
ALAN WARE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £104.22k £89.36k £111.13k £136.58k £158.38k
Total expenditure £68.36k £28.88k £47.97k £87.06k £72.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 02 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 25 April 2024 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 25 April 2024 80 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 22 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 BLAKE STREET
YORK
YO1 8XJ
Phone:
01904625678
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available