THE CHARLES WRIGHT GOWTHORPE CLERGY AUGMENTATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In accordance with the terms of the Trust grants are made to C of E clergy within 10 Miles of St Peters Church Nottingham at the Trustee discretion to augment their living costs . The Trustee is satisfied that the purposes remain charitable. The Trustee have complied with the duty in Section 4 of the Charity Act 06 to have due regard to public benefit guidance published by the Charity Comm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derby City
- Leicester City
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 06 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LLOYDS BANK PRIVATE BANKING LTD | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £2.50k | £2.13k | £2.46k | £3.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £2.02k | £5.12k | £2.80k | £3.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 28TH APRIL 1949: COURT ORDER DATED 20/7/1953 AND SCHEME OF 23RD SEPTEMBER 1970 AND 26 FEBRUARY 1976
Charitable objects
THE MAKING OF GRANTS OF CLERGYMEN AND THEIR WIDOWS WHO FULFIL CERTAIN CONDITIONS AN WHO SHALL APPEAR TO THE TRUSTEE(LLOYDS BANK LIMITED) TO BE DESERVING THE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
TEN MILES RAD RADIOUS FROM ST. PETER'S CHURCH NOTTINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lloyds Banking Group
City Park
The Droveway
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 7AU
- Phone:
- 0345 300 0304
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window