THE GOOD SHEPHERD HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 213872
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 1986: Standard registration
  • 28 October 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • THE GOOD SHEPHERD TRUST (Working name)
  • THE GOOD SHEPHERD HOME TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not submitted

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 10TH JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED ON 19TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND FURTHER ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES CARRIED OUT IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE RELATING TO THE PROMOTION OF THE WORK OF FAMILY AND MORAL WELFARE IN COLCHESTER AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Registration history
  • 16 June 1986 : Standard registration
  • 28 October 2004 : Removed