SIR JOHN PERROT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The improvement of the town and architectural facilities of Haverfordwest. Provision of low cost housing to individuals in Haverfordwest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 07 January 1963: Standard registration
- SIR JOHN PERROT (Previous name)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ALLAN STOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pat Barker | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Hill | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Simister | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Jill Owens | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Arthur Brooker | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Shane Pearce | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Martin Lewis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Derek Rees | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicola Howells | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.44k | £134.14k | £139.32k | £138.02k | £152.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.88k | £32.79k | £39.44k | £109.70k | £60.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 14 FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE TOWN OF HAVERFORDWEST.
Area of benefit
HAVERFORDWEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TITHE EXCHANGE
9 VICTORIA PLACE
HAVERFORDWEST
DYFED
SA61 2JX
- Phone:
- 01437762538
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window