THE MOLYNEUX ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 213895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to provide social housing for the poor and those in need who were either born or are long term residents of Tunbridge Wells (now or in the past)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £158,043
Total expenditure: £97,430

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILLIAN ANNE PRATER Chair 29 June 2023
None on record
Philip Edward Vernon Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
Ann McCue Trustee 27 January 2025
None on record
REV RONALD ERNEST NATHAN WILLIAMS Trustee 26 April 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, RUSTHALL
Received: 5 days late
BARRY JOHN EDWARDS Trustee 02 November 2021
RUSTHALL COMMUNITY AND YOUTH PROJECT
Received: On time
WENTWORTH JOHN ROBERTS Trustee 23 August 2021
None on record
Claire Joanna Gomez Trustee 17 March 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £122.05k £121.46k £128.54k £123.91k £158.04k
Total expenditure £91.43k £99.92k £103.05k £108.84k £97.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 SHIRLEY GARDENS
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 8TG
Phone:
07504839548