RIDGEWAY MEMORIAL COMMUNITY AND SPORTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a community centre and playing field for the use of the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of political,religious or other opinions, including use for meetings,lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 December 1963: Standard registration
- RIDGEWAY SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB (Working name)
- RIDGEWAY WAR MEMORIAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Roberts | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Oxley | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gare | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Marie Horsfield | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lawford | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DYE | Trustee | 17 June 2011 |
|
|||||
PAULINE MARY CARTLEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DESMOND MASON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE POWDRILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.28k | £65.61k | £62.19k | £72.68k | £64.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.25k | £40.36k | £66.67k | £74.59k | £65.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.63k | £12.18k | N/A | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10TH JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
OBJECT OF CHARITY: (1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
RIDGEWAY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARTER LANE FARM
CARTERHALL LANE
SHEFFIELD
S12 3XD
- Phone:
- 07813458406
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window