Accounts and annual returns PARISH HALL

Charity number: 213975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2024 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2024 712 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required