PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS ULCOMBE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 25 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mair Chantler | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Austin | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Banham | Trustee | 25 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY DAVIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
RITA STRUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOLLY POULTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GOODE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £1.13k | £1.17k | £1.22k | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.13k | £111 | £1.01k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2024 | 712 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 1 JANUARY 1921 AND SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF 29 JULY 1996 AND 17 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL USE OF THE COMMUNITY, PARTICULARLY FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
ULCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
KNOWLE HILL FARM
KNOWLE HILL
ULCOMBE
MAIDSTONE
ME17 1ES
- Phone:
- 01622858191
- Email:
- allsaintsulcombe@lvb.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window