THE INSTITUTION OF GAS ENGINEERS AND MANAGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Professional Membership Institution and provider of Industry Technical Standards. Organiser of related conferences, seminars and events to facilitate and enhance Member benefits, careers, technical knowledge, learning and development. To serve Gas Professionals Worldwide and promote safety and excellence within the industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,669,543
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.47m | |
Other trading activities | £90.03k | |
Investments | £107.50k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,831,989
Raising funds | £31.53k | |
Charitable activities | £2.80m | |
Other | £0 |
£87,658 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £31.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.80m |
People

26 Employee(s)
24 Trustee(s)
608 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- THE IGEM (Working name)
- THE INSTITUTION OF GAS ENGINEERS AND MANAGERS (Working name)
- THE INSTITUTION OF GAS ENGINEERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Sykes-Tucker | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Nick Jerman | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kieren Shipp | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marc Owen | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jodie McEvoy | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josh Williams-Trim | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Guiry | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Stevenson | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Chan | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daren Dickinson | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dunn | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Cheung | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John McCorry | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Earl Richards | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Madgett | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sikander Mahmood | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Tomkin | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Elsom | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Wimpenny | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Evans | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Simon Joyce | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon McMillan | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Musgrave | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14m | £2.18m | £2.07m | £2.45m | £2.67m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25m | £1.93m | £2.27m | £2.78m | £2.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £103.49k | £39.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.13k | £52.38k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £84.56k | £0 | £27.97k | £57.65k | £90.03k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.96m | £2.03m | £1.95m | £2.30m | £2.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.44k | £75.24k | £84.77k | £90.91k | £107.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £24.46k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.21m | £1.91m | £2.25m | £2.75m | £2.80m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £41.32k | £17.23k | £10.99k | £26.69k | £31.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.10k | £0 | £10.57k | £0 | £32.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £7.97k | £7.85k | £7.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.87m | £1.24m | £1.24m | £1.22m | £1.17m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £3.79m | £4.27m | £3.75m | £3.85m | |
|
Other assets | £1.06m | £1.40m | £1.24m | £807.80k | £866.91k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £755.73k | £828.40k | £878.11k | £760.50k | £949.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 1929 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 3 MAY 1950, 23 JUNE 1960 AND 2 MAY 1969; BYE-LAWS AMENDED IN 1972, 1974 AND ON 17 MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE BY RESEARCH, DISCUSSION, EDUCATION OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE SEEN BY THE INSTITUTION DESIRABLE EACH AND ALL OF THE SCIENCES OF WHICH KNOWLEDGE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE REQUIRED FOR THE BETTER EXPLORATION FOR OR THE BETTER PRODUCTION WINNING TREATMENT TRANSMISSION DISTRIBUTION OR UTILISATION OF GAS AND OF THE BY-PRODUCTS OF ITS PRODUCTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ARTHUR DUCKHAM MEMORIAL FUND
- BIRMINGHAM MEDAL FUND
- CHARLES HUNT MEMORIAL MEDAL FUND
- CORBET AND HENRY WOODALL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- DEMPSTER TRAVELLING FELLOWSHIP FUND
- DIETERICHS MACLAY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- H E JONES LONDON MEDAL FUND
- JAMES ARCHIBALD MACLAY MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- THE INSTITUTION OF GAS ENGINEERS AND MANAGERS SCHOLARSHIPS, MEDALS, PRIZES AND LECTURESHIPS FUND
- W H BENNETT TRAVELLING FELLOWSHIP FUND
- WILLIAM CARTWRIGHT HOLMES SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- 03 September 1968 : Standard registration
- 14 December 1999 : Removed
- 14 December 1999 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
I G E M
28 HIGH STREET
KEGWORTH
DERBY
DE74 2DA
- Phone:
- 01509678167
- Email:
- lesley@igem.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window