Accounts and annual returns MRS E LEGGETT

Charity Number: 214061
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2014 12 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2013 08 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2012 13 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2011 10 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 Not Required