FRANCO-BRITISH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include organising events,encouraging the cultural and educational links between Britain and France.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 23 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD MICHAEL FAIRBAIRN | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|||||
George Frederick Merrylees | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RT HON DOMINIC GRIEVE QC MP | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.90k | £18.18k | £11.98k | £14.87k | £7.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.86k | £21.18k | £16.02k | £17.34k | £14.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 December 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 1947 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 6 MAY 1964 AND 29 APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND, AS ANCILLARY TO THAT OBJECT TO INCREASE AND DISSEMINATE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM KNOWLEDGE OF FRANCE AND THE FRENCH WAY OF LIFE, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ITS ECONOMIC, SOCIAL, POLITICAL, HISTORICAL AND CULTURAL INSTITUTIONS AND DEVELOPMENTS, AND TO AFFORD OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE STUDY OF ALL ASPECTS OF FRENCH LIFE AND THOUGHT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Franco-British Council
167-169 Great Portland Street
5th Floor
London
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07494547261
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window