LINCOLNSHIRE MASONIC CHARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money for Masonic Charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Antony Ellis | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Charles William Jackson | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Barry Crutchley | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Tong | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
David Malcolm Wheeler | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
ANTHONY DAVID MILLER JP | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Bruce Michael Goodman | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|||||||
Ian Martin Pounder | Trustee | 01 May 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.05k | £25.06k | £9.26k | £6.90k | £12.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.60k | £84.01k | £984 | £690 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS CERTIFIED ON 4TH JANUARY 1963 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 11 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
SUPPORT OF MASONIC CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masonic Hall
Cambridge Road
GRIMSBY
DN34 5SZ
- Phone:
- 01472 870042
- Email:
- office@pgllincs.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window