THE JOHN BYRON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes charitable donations to individuals and organisations in Hucknall, Nottinghamshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 April 1963: Standard registration
- THE BYRON CHARITY (Working name)
- BYRON'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Robbins | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ian Briggs | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Kenneth Mann | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Shaw | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Waters | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Helen Chantry | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara McDonald | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR LOCKE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
John Wilmott | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hinsley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Knowles | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Rostance | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208 | £403 | £397 | £396 | £597 | |
|
Total expenditure | £575 | £400 | £400 | £395 | £495 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REP VOL. 21 PP 409. SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSION 26 MAY 1888 VARIED 12 OCTOBER 1915.
Charitable objects
INCOME DIVIDED INTO THREE PARTS AS FOLLOWS, (1) CHURCH BRANCH - FOR MAINTENANCE OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF HUCKNALL. (2) ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH - FOR THE POOR, IN THE FORM OF GIFTS IN KIND OR TEMPORARY RELIEF IN MONEY, BY LOAN OR OTHERWISE. AID IN SICKNESS. COST OF OUTFITS ON ENTERING A TRADE OR OCCUPATION (3) GENERAL BRANCH - FOR PAROCHIAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
HUCKNALL TORKARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 PARK DRIVE
HUCKNALL
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01159633735
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window