Trustees THE JOHN BYRON CHARITY
Charity number: 214178

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Robbins | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ian Briggs | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Kenneth Mann | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Shaw | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Waters | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Helen Chantry | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara McDonald | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR LOCKE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
John Wilmott | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hinsley | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Knowles | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Rostance | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.