CHARITY OF THOMAS BREWER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of the poverty..Support for projects of benefit to the residents in Winthorpe, Langford and Holme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 14 February 1963: Standard registration
- THOMAS BREWER'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Michael Lord | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Applewhite | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Barthorpe | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Masheder | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Cammack | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Neil Edward Moran | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.61k | £4.70k | £2.21k | £1.98k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.09k | £2.15k | £3.65k | £3.67k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 1 NOVEMBER 1977 AND RESOLUTION UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE VILLAGES OF WINTHORPE, LANGFORD AND HOLME, THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE ENDEAVOURS BY ORGANIZATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE ABOVE RESIDENTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WINTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Pocklington Crescent
Winthorpe
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG24 2PG
- Phone:
- 01636674039
- Email:
- david.barthorpe@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window