THE FOX AND NOBLETT BRADWELL CHARITY
Charity Number: 214219
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty and distress within the parish of Bradwell Derbyshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Total income: £1,190
Total expenditure: £930
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Derbyshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 15 January 1963: Standard registration
- 15 April 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- THE FOX AND NOBLETT BRADWELL CHARITY (Working name)
- FOX'S BRADWELL CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £903 | £930 | £929 | £708 | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £935 | £985 | £985 | £610 | £930 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 24 November 2017 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 18 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL AND CODICIL OF THE LATE SAMUEL FOX, PROVED ON THE 23 MAY 1887
Charitable objects
TO GIVE RELIEF TO PERSONS IN POVERTY AND DISTRESS RESIDING WITHIN THE PARISH OF BRADWELL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF BRADWELL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window