THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 214278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintains the Town Hall and Museum for the benefit of residents and visitors to Corfe Castle. The museum focuses on the heritage and economy of Purbeck in general and Corfe Castle village in particular.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,060
Total expenditure: £47,194

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TOWN TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Louise HAYWOOD Chair 16 January 2021
DORSET RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
Martin Eric Rowell Trustee 13 May 2024
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Jonathan Lermit Trustee 13 May 2024
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
David Mark Churchill Trustee 01 December 2023
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
Angela Hazel Elaine Sturch Trustee 14 April 2021
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Roland Bryan Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Mitchell Trustee 15 April 2020
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
Adriana Elizabeth Proudman Trustee 15 April 2020
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
Shaun Paul Fuller Trustee 09 January 2020
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
COLIN JAMES FULLER Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record
Victoria Jane de Wit Trustee 03 October 2017
THE CORFE CASTLE TOWN TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.56k £14.16k £14.55k £11.43k £6.06k
Total expenditure £6.93k £20.38k £5.06k £14.56k £47.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 April 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Toms Mead
Corfe Castle
Wareham
BH20 5HH
Phone:
01929481375
Email:
No information available