Financial history ST AGNES HOME

Charity number: 214311
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £7.51k £6.58k £6.62k £6.67k £6.72k
Total expenditure £9.70k £7.00k £7.00k £8.21k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A