DONCASTER MUNICIPAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 214327
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is the consolidation of the following charities 214327-1 to 214327-6.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Total income: £1,323
Total expenditure: £92
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Doncaster
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 February 1963: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £715 | £1.17k | £1.20k | £1.47k | £1.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155 | £196 | £116 | £92 | £92 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DONCASTER COUNTY BOROUGH
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 18 MAY 1928.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SICK AND POOR FILE 226618 CLOSED-DUPLICATE REGISTRATION
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DONCASTER
Registration history
- 28 February 1963 : Standard registration
- 09 June 2011 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window