MONUMENTAL BRASS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation, research, understanding and appreciation of Incised Slabs, Indents and Monumental Brasses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- United States
Governance
- 27 November 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelcey Wilson-Lee | Chair | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Hugh Guilford | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Challe Hudson | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Ling | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Lucia Diaz Pascual | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Anne Metcalfe | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
John Stephen Lee | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
PENNY WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 August 2015 |
|
|||||||||
STEPHEN GILES HUDSON FREETH | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTIN STUCHFIELD | Trustee | 13 November 1982 |
|
|||||||||
NICHOLAS JOHN ROGERS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
THE VEN DAVID GWYNNE MEARA MA, FSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR NIGEL EDWARD SAUL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.29k | £41.73k | £10.82k | £12.93k | £12.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.63k | £9.00k | £8.22k | £9.17k | £9.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AMENDED 1 APRIL 1967
Charitable objects
1) TO ENDEAVOUR TO ENSURE THE BETTER PRESERVATION OF MONUMENTAL BRASSES, INDENTS OF LOST BRASSES AND INCISED SLABS. 2) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF, AND INTEREST IN MONUMENTAL BRASSES, INDENTS AND INCISED SLABS BY THE PUBLICATION OF TRANSACTIONS AND PORTFOLIOS OF FACSIMILE REPRODUCTINS AND IN ANY OTHER WAY POSSIBLE. 3) TO COMPILE WITH A VIEW TO PUBLICATION A LIST OF ALL EXTANT BRASSES, INDENTS AND INCISES SLABS, BOTH BRITISH AND FOREIGN AND OF ALL LOST BRASSES, INDENTS AND INCISED SLABS, BOTH BRITISH AND FOREIGN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 St. Brides Road
Aberkenfig
Bridgend
South Wales
CF32 9PY
- Phone:
- 07972 877339
- Email:
- penny7441@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window