UNCLE BILLY'S CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide poor children resident in the prescribed streets with an annual treat
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 29 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Alexander McLaren | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Croot | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham King | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Shaw | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Peet | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Caulfield | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £1.85k | £1.66k | £1.82k | £5.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46k | £0 | £3.50k | £1.95k | £3.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 20 OCTOBER 1953 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 19 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FOR SCHOOL CHILDREN OVER THE AGE OF FOUR YEARS AND UNDER THE AGE OF TWELVE YEARS RESIDENT IN THE PRESCRIBED STREETS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AT LEAST ONE ENJOYABLE EVENT EACH YEAR; (B) IN OHTER-WISE RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 16 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE PRESCRIBED STREETS WHO ARE CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANT OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
CERTAIN STREETS SITUATED IN THE BOROUGH OF CHESTERFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHIEF EXECUTIVES OFFICE
TOWN HALL
CHESTERFIELD
DERBYSHIRE
S40 1LP
- Phone:
- 01246 959657
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window