TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities work towards improving the art of town and country planning and in reaching our objectives: securing decent homes for everyone in a good human-scale environment combining the best features of town and country; empowering people and communities to influence decisions that affect them; and improving the planning system in accordance with the principles of sustainable development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,098,287
Donations and legacies | £319 | |
Charitable activities | £1.09m | |
Other trading activities | £3.88k | |
Investments | £5.35k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,073,388
Raising funds | £2.24k | |
Charitable activities | £1.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £320,736 from 197 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.07m | |
Retained for future use | £24.90k |
People

15 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 July 1965: Standard registration
- TCPA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aamina Khan | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Riva Kapoor | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Rose Sewell | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simin Davoudi | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Stuart Daniel Andrews | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mark Gallent | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aranvir Singh Gawera | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geraghty | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA RIDDELL | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN SMITH | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gilian MacInnes | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pritchard | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Fryer | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14m | £971.13k | £1.02m | £1.10m | £1.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22m | £1.01m | £998.56k | £1.10m | £1.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £317.95k | £245.63k | £226.23k | £228.04k | £320.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £301 | £25.95k | £10.63k | £591 | £319 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £14.90k | £1.47k | £2.28k | £5.67k | £3.88k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.13m | £942.15k | £1.00m | £1.10m | £1.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.63k | £1.56k | £631 | £1.77k | £5.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.22m | £1.01m | £995.92k | £1.09m | £1.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.27k | £3.06k | £2.64k | £2.69k | £2.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £52.19k | £48.83k | £49.19k | £54.14k | £54.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.48k | £14.07k | £24.65k | £22.68k | £16.18k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £857.01k | £853.49k | £851.54k | £822.83k | £799.88k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £373.80k | £405.50k | £395.12k | £356.91k | £302.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD MARCH 1917 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 13TH APRIL 1965, 25TH JANUARY 1989, 18TH APRIL 1989, 25TH APRIL 1995 AND 24TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 13 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING, AND TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF EVERY DESCRIPTION IN THE SAID ART AND SCIENCE AND IN ALL OTHER ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED THEREWITH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWN & COUNTRY PLANNING ASSOCIATION
17 CARLTON HOUSE TERRACE
LONDON
SW1Y 5AS
- Phone:
- 02079308903
- Email:
- fiona.howie@tcpa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window