UPTON ST LEONARDS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation and maintenance of the Village Hall for the benefit of the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Pearson | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katherine Eleizabeth Lucy Brooks | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomas Patterson | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle King | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Browne | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Evans | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH DESFORGES POTHS | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ann Pearson | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEWART TEDALDI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.64k | £24.38k | £30.68k | £36.59k | £28.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.31k | £20.37k | £21.59k | £34.46k | £23.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.64k | £4.18k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 3RD JULY 1984, AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 2 JUNE 2003 AND BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES 24 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF UPTN ST. LEONARDS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLICICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF UPTON ST. LEONARDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Bondend Road
Upton St. Leonards
GLOUCESTER
GL4 8DX
- Phone:
- 01452617349
- Email:
- knollcott@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.