Accounts and annual returns STRANGEWAYS RESEARCH LABORATORY

Charity number: 214437
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 15 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 15 December 2008 On Time