Financial history STRANGEWAYS RESEARCH LABORATORY

Charity number: 214437
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £758.42k £821.50k £885.70k £1.16m £977.66k
Total expenditure £730.20k £755.07k £849.61k £833.71k £1.17m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £291 £7.05k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £791.69k £851.01k £1.11m £947.16k
Income - Endowments N/A £291 £7.04k £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £26.23k £24.60k £39.60k £29.79k
Income - Other N/A £3.29k £3.04k £1.27k £709
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £742.18k £823.98k £806.10k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £12.90k £25.63k £26.87k £24.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £739 £1.31k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0