THE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 214510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We distribute £70.00 each, twice a year, to the 5 oldest men in the village plus the vicar. We also distribute £30.00 to the oldest ladies in the village (20-25)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £660
Total expenditure: £388

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lionel Thomas Blower Trustee 01 January 2014
THE G A BURTON TRUST
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN ARTHUR NEWBOLD
Received: On time
CHARITY OF ROBERT BARNARD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £399 £401 £74 £645 £660
Total expenditure £365 £365 £365 £365 £388
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 November 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 17 SEPTEMBER 1909
Charitable objects
CLOTHING ETC. FOR THE DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS BONA FIDE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF SILEBY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SILEBY
Registration history
  • 28 February 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SILEBY PARISH COUNCIL
41 HIGH STREET
SILEBY
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 7RX
Phone:
01509813075
Website:

No information available