Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM MEDLEY'S CHARITY
Charity number: 214513

Charity reporting is up to date (110 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 January 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 462 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2023 | 19 February 2025 | 462 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 January 2022 | 03 February 2025 | 811 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 January 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 January 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window