Financial history WILLIAM MEDLEY'S CHARITY

Charity number: 214513
Charity reporting is up to date (110 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/01/2020 15/01/2021 15/01/2022 15/01/2023 15/01/2024
Total gross income £59.11k £14.10k £24.52k £32.60k £34.83k
Total expenditure £11.56k £7.87k £26.59k £14.30k £46.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A