Financial history CHILDREN'S BOOT FUND

Charity number: 214524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £12.69k £18.46k £22.45k £20.30k £26.58k
Total expenditure £16.90k £11.56k £23.56k £30.03k £28.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A