Trustees CHILDREN'S BOOT FUND

Charity number: 214524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET MCCONKEY Chair 12 September 1982
None on record
matthew white Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Jennifer Watkins Trustee 03 January 2023
None on record
Suzanne Whiteman Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
Jacky Lapworth Trustee 27 September 2012
None on record
LUCY CHARLOTTE HARDSTAFF Trustee 12 March 2009
None on record
PATRICIA TIMMONS Trustee 12 September 2001
None on record
WILLIAM FRANK SMITH Trustee 12 September 1993
None on record
PETER ROBERT HENRY HANCOCK Trustee 12 September 1981
None on record