Financial history THE ROGATE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 214550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £43.31k £58.22k £44.00k £35.79k £46.15k
Total expenditure £30.64k £25.23k £42.03k £29.60k £41.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £33.09k £2.67k N/A N/A