SOUTH FERRIBY CHURCH ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To pay the income of the Charity to the Churchwardens of the Parish of South Ferriby for the maintenance and repair of the fabric of the Parish Church of South Ferriby and towards the maintenance of the services of the said Church and of the furniture thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 03 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HENRY CLARK | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicholas John Grounds | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Foster | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID ROWETT | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JOHN LORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £805 | £813 | £820 | £832 | £833 | |
|
Total expenditure | £805 | £813 | £820 | £821 | £832 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 07 SEPTEMBER 1886."AND 30 MARCH 1995".
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES OF THE CHURCH AND THE FURNITURE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7A Priestgate
BARTON-UPON-HUMBER
DN18 5ET
- Phone:
- 07849076904
- Email:
- njg.ferriby@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window