THE CROYDON LODGE OF CONCORD NO 463 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to local and national charities and organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Robert Billington | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.48k | £1.08k | £552 | £3.41k | £540 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.63k | £1.02k | £250 | £3.50k | £510 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 517 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 517 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH JANUARY 1931 (MODEL) (3)
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS, THEIR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 Kechill Gardens
Hayes
Bromley
BR2 7NB
- Phone:
- 02084622972
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window