CHARITY OF WILLIAM CHESTER (CROXTON KERRIAL SHARE)

Charity Number: 214634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational-provision of Bibles to village school leavers. Relief of poverty within the village.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,800
Total expenditure: £1,792

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr RICHARD GLYN BRADLEY Chair 29 July 2022
CHARITY OF EDWARD HALLAM
Received: On time
EDWARD HALLAM'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Jinks Trustee 20 July 2018
CHARITY OF EDWARD HALLAM
Received: On time
EDWARD HALLAM'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Richard Botterill Trustee 20 July 2018
THE WILLIAM CHESTER ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
EDWARD HALLAM'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.80k £1.80k £1.88k £2.08k £1.80k
Total expenditure £1.76k £1.80k £1.88k £2.08k £1.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 August 2024 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Mill Lane
Croxton Kerrial
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG32 1RA
Phone:
0797 4686782
Website:

No information available