THE LOUGHBOROUGH WELFARE TRUSTS

Charity number: 214654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide benefit for residents of the old borough of Loughborough through the relief of poverty and sickness and advancement of education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27,504
Total expenditure: £28,980

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAULINE RANSON Chair
DR BABINGTONS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOSEPH CLARKE'S (LOUGHBOROUGH AND VILLAGES) APPRENTICING FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RECREATION GROUND BARROW UPON SOAR
Received: On time
Michael Dennis Devlin Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Mark Royston Murphy Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Councillor Joan Margaret Smidowicz Cllr Trustee 02 November 2023
UPSTARTS GYMNASTICS CIO
Recently registered
Councillor Andrew Peter Haynes Cllr Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Councillor Sarah Goode Cllr Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Dr Diane Harper Trustee 18 November 2021
None on record
Margaret Hutchinson Trustee 15 July 2021
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH, LOUGHBOROUGH
Received: On time
ANN MADDOCKS Trustee 17 November 2016
THE DAWSON AND FOWLER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sandra Forrest Trustee 17 August 2016
JOHN STORER HOUSE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RECREATION GROUND BARROW UPON SOAR
Received: On time
JOHN STORER CHARNWOOD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.07k £26.82k £24.04k £28.98k £27.50k
Total expenditure £45.02k £43.42k £38.25k £41.67k £28.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 11 OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
AUGMENTING THAT PART OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES CALLED LOUGHBOROUGH WELFARE TRUSTS APPLICABLE IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF LOUGHBOROUGH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. PRIOR TO SCHEME REGISTERED UNDER 215356
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 16 May 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
20 CHURCHGATE
LOUGHBOROUGH
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE11 1UD
Phone:
07765934117
Website:

No information available