ROYAL LONDON SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Royal London Society provides grants to serving prisoners, those recently released and those under probation/supervision living/intending to live in Greater London. These grants are aimed at providing sustainable, employments through the provision of training, acquisition of skill, tools of trade or suitable qualifications and some grants are of a therapeutic nature. The society also provides gran
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 January 1963: Standard registration
- 07 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- ROYAL LONDON AID SOCIETY (Previous name)
- ROYAL LONDON AID SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.10k | £97.78k | £338.54k | £132.92k | £68.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.00k | £198.25k | £236.83k | £170.19k | £981.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 February 2018 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 February 2018 | 13 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 13 February 2018 | 470 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 26 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH JUNE 1963 AS AMENDED ON THE 8TH MARCH 1971, 9TH JUNE 1980, 28TH SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 16 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PRISONERS BOTH BEFORE AND AFTER DISCHARGE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS BEING PROPER OBJECTS OF CHARITY AND IN WAYS THAT ARE CHARITABLE, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window