THE JAMES AND ADA ROBB CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide almshouses for persons who are or have been resident in the City of Birmingham who are in reduced or necessitous circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 January 1963: Standard registration
- 25 November 2015: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1157777 THE JAMES AND ADA ROBB CHARITY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.54k | £52.04k | £57.74k | £55.31k | £59.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.55k | £47.77k | £48.10k | £64.85k | £44.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 06 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 06 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 02 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 21 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 21 December 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 31ST JANUARY 1951
Charitable objects
TRUST FUND FOR ACQUIRING AND MAINTAINING ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS WHO ARE REDUCED OR NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES RESIDENT OF FORMERLY RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM WITH QUALIFICATION AS DETERMINED BY TRUSTEES. RESIDUE OF INCOME FOR STIPENDS FOR INMATES OF THE ALMSHOUSES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window