Financial history TOKE AND STREETER ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 214748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.01k £17.54k £28.00k £19.17k £17.48k
Total expenditure £29.81k £9.04k £20.65k £14.11k £12.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A