WILLIAM DUDLEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bursaries and grants to benefit young people starting up in life (restricted programmes). Grants to charities established to relieve need, hardship and distress Area of benefit City of Birmingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 30 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANIL BHALLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rielladice Nyambira | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR Hester Camilla Smith | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CLIFF | Trustee | 04 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Dudley | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN TALBOYS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.99k | £38.79k | £48.15k | £48.37k | £50.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.42k | £54.69k | £57.66k | £54.93k | £59.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 19TH FEBRUARY 1997.
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OR ESTABLISHMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN FINANCIAL NEED, STUDYING, WORKING OR RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY WAY OF GRANTS, LOANS OR BURSARIES FROM THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY. SEE SCHEME FOR FULL DETAILS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 17077
BIRMINGHAM
B2 2NF
- Phone:
- 0121 354 7789
- Email:
- info@williamdudleytrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window