AMBLESIDE WELFARE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants and donations to applicants who must be resident in the Ambleside ward of the Lakes Urban Council, for "Need, Hardship and Distress". Monies for distribution from leasing out of two town centre properties as retail outlets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 28 April 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS MARTIN | Chair | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Shepherd | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Smith | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
VERNON RIGG | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
FIONA WOODBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN ELLERAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.93k | £15.30k | £70.86k | £61.51k | £60.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.04k | £27.12k | £41.06k | £37.87k | £33.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28 APRIL 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
AMBLESIDE WARD OF THE LAKES URBAN DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Hill Top View
Bowburn
DURHAM
DH6 5BU
- Phone:
- 07706847112
- Email:
- mjohn59655uk@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window