DR MILLEY'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering affordable accomodation to ladies of all ages and all circumstances, who may have difficulty renting in the private sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 29 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Werry | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Douthwaite | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Harvey - Coggins | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Marjorie Linger | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GALLAGHER | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Mark Lupton | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|||||
GAIL RYAN | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Wendy Dee | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|||||
DONNA MARIE GREATOREX | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Elaine Price | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
CYNTHIA Mary TIPPER | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Roger Michael Hartley | Trustee | 19 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.20k | £55.99k | £88.75k | £69.36k | £47.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.95k | £35.71k | £36.08k | £51.21k | £68.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2015 as amended on 06 Jun 2019 as amended on 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
A)THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR POOR WOMEN WHO: I) ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND II) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA COVERED BY LICHFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL AND B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO THOSE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF LICHFIELD.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF LICHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dr Milleys Almshouses
7 Beacon Street
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS13 7AA
- Phone:
- 07580971928
- Email:
- drmilleys@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window