JOHN BOWGIN (BURGH CASTLE) TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently acting as a holding fund as there are insufficient funds to make grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 May 1963: Standard registration
- 27 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BOWGINS CHARITY FOR THE POOR (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62 | £23 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 24 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 07 March 2011 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 11TH MAY 1871 (U.V.57 P.216) AND SCHEME DATED 26TH JUNE 1931, AS AMENDED ON 11TH MARCH 2005 BY A RES. PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S 74(2)(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993. AS AMENDED 4TH MAY 2005 UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S74(2)(D) CA1993
Charitable objects
FOR ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN BURGH CASTLE WHO WISH TO GO ON TO FURTHER EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS
Area of benefit
BURGH CASTLE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window