Governing document THE DE CARTERET TRUST
Charity Number: 214830
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF BISHOP DE CARTERET PROVIDED ON 17TH MARCH 1932 SEE UV 253 P.27 AND 28 SCHEME DATED 21ST JULY 1964 AND 15TH OCTOBER 1975 AND SCHEME SEALED 23RD APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17 MAY 2005 PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ALLOWANCES FOR WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS IN ENGLAND WITH PREFERENCE GIVEN TO WIDOWS WITH YOUNG CHILDREN DEPENDENT ON THEM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.