THE AZELIA HALL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Hall for use by the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 27 February 1963: Standard registration
- 07 April 1998: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS STANLEY JOHN KANAAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Zena Jane Walsh | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nina Pavlova Clevarly Kelly | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Young | Trustee | 07 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHIL FINCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIC HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENISE MARIE BELFOURD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.60k | £83.47k | £91.71k | £44.64k | £104.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.48k | £48.56k | £51.23k | £47.87k | £103.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.58k | £17.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME ON 30TH MARCH 1998. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 AUG 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT,PARTICULARLY PERSONS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT,DISABLED OR INFIRM,WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,INCLUDING USE FOR 1)MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES. 2) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. 3) THE SURPLUS FUNDS MAY BE APPLIED FOR THE RELIEF OF THE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF BECKENHAM AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Linked charities
- 27 February 1963 : Standard registration
- 07 April 1998 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Samuel Court
Kelsey Park Avenue
Beckenham
BR3 6UN
- Phone:
- 02086505620
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window