PRITCHETT'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 214896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the poor of this village

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF PLUMTREE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL CLARK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 05 December 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 28 May 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ORCHARD
CHURCH LANE
PLUMTREE
NOTTINGHAM
NG12 5NE
Phone:
01159374915
Website:

No information available